HENRY HANLEY FOR ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 220718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide almshouse accommodation to poor persons of good character by letting of its nine properties.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,085
Total expenditure: £22,989

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HANLEY AND GELLESTROPE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Ethan Radford Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Councillor Rebecca Langton Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Councillor Phil Jackson Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Councillor Maria Joannou Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Councillor Wendy Smith Trustee 06 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.00k £40.21k £42.85k £44.22k £41.09k
Total expenditure £47.40k £20.51k £18.45k £21.77k £22.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 2ND JUNE 1959
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE RESIDENT AT THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Registration history
  • 06 August 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
NOTTINGHAM CITY HOMES
LOXLEY HOUSE
STATION STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 3NJ
Phone:
01157469074
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available