THE HULL & EAST YORKSHIRE CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of social amenities, recreational and other facilities in Hull for the deaf and hard of hearing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 15 July 1963: Standard registration
- INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF (Working name)
- THE DEAF INSTITUTE (Working name)
- HULL AND EAST RIDING INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- THE HULL & EAST YORKSHIRE INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- THE HULL, EAST YORKSHIRE AND LINCOLNSHIRE INSTITUTION FOR THE DEAF AND DUMB (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Laura Duke | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Michelle Andrews | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dorley | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Christopher Franklin | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Harness | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stanley James Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Lyster Barwick | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Smedley | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Jean Simpson | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENRY ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MALCOLM TERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.00k | £45.76k | £38.95k | £65.43k | £75.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.91k | £83.96k | £99.29k | £108.08k | £114.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/12/1925 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL SOCIAL AND GENERAL WELFARE OF DEAF PEOPLE BY ESTABLISHING AND/OR OPERATING A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR DEAF PEOPLE AND THOSE WITH HEARING IMPAIRMENT.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON-UPON-HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deaf Centre
63 Spring Bank
HULL
HU3 1AG
- Phone:
- 01482 223911
- Email:
- info@hulldeafcentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window