REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON'S RICHMOND CHARITY

Charity number: 220779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity gives small grants for educational and training purposes. Also it gives grants for hardship. Recipients must live within the boundaries of Richmond, North Yorkshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,780
Total expenditure: £7,749

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Caroline Rosamund Pinchbeck Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Angela Jane Dale Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Dr Peter Nicholas Trewby Trustee 01 November 2018
THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, RICHMOND, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RICHMOND WITH HUDSWELL
Received: On time
Rev Martin Fletcher Rev Trustee 31 May 2018
HUDSWELL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RICHMOND WITH HUDSWELL
Received: On time
REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON'S GILLING CHARITY
Received: On time
REVEREND JOHN JACKSON'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
HUDSWELL COMMUNITY CHARITY
Received: On time
Lorraine Hodgson Trustee 31 May 2018
THE RICHMOND SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
CATTERICK, RICHMOND AND COLBURN COMMUNITY LIBRARIES
Received: On time
Suzanne Gregory Trustee 31 May 2018
None on record
Rev Antony Kirby Trustee 10 November 2015
REVEREND MATTHEW HUTCHINSON'S GILLING CHARITY
Received: On time
Linda Curran DL Trustee 15 August 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.54k £3.46k £2.46k £3.63k £4.78k
Total expenditure £1.78k £995 £1.76k £7.24k £7.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 January 2025 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MIDDLEMOOR HOUSE
HUDSWELL
RICHMOND
DL11 6DB
Phone:
07432656116
Website:

No information available