CMB CHARITIES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 January 1963: Standard registration
- 07 February 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- M B CHARITIES LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £608 | £610 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.99k | £7.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 17 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 26 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 26 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH MAY 1957
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITIES, AND IN SUCH WAYS AS FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUBSCRIBE AND MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE BODIES OR INSTITUTIONS S THE COUNCIL OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME TO TIME MAY SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window