THE OLD AGE PENSIONERS' REST ROOM MADELEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Madeley Rest Room is a club for retired people meeting for Christian fellowship every Friday morning in our own building, when we listen to a variety of different speakers. There are regular outings and events throughout the year including founder's day, open day, anniversary, annual party and christmas lunch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 20 May 1968: Standard registration
- THE REST ROOM (Working name)
- THE OLD AGE PENSIONER'S REST ROOM MADELEY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR C R MOORE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY WRIGHT | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS M B MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNA SARAH MATILDA KATHLEEN COOKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.17k | £3.45k | £2.68k | £4.67k | £4.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.71k | £1.08k | £2.69k | £4.05k | £5.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2024 | 732 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2024 | 1097 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2024 | 1462 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 25TH NOVEMBER 1955, AMENDED 19TH APRIL 1963
Charitable objects
REST ROOM FOR THE RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELL-BEING OF OLD AGE PENSIONERS AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THEIR BENEFIT AS SHALL BE AGREED UPON.
Area of benefit
MADELEY AND DISTRICT (2 MILE RADIUS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARK HOUSE
PARK LANE
MADELEY
TELFORD
TF7 5HF
- Phone:
- 01952585231
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window