BURY HEARING HUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social afternoons, social evenings, sing & sign groups, church service for the deaf, free lipreading classes, British Sign Language courses level I, II, III. hot food, equipment try before you buy centre, Signpost & support centre 11am to 3pm Mon-Fri.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 07 August 1963: Standard registration
- 21 March 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 21 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1191838 BOLTON DEAF SOCIETY
- BURY METRO DEAF SOCIETY (Working name)
- BURY AND DISTRICT DEAF AND DUMB SOCIETY (Previous name)
- BURY METROPOLITAN DEAF SOCIETY (Previous name)
- BURY SOCIETY FOR DEAF & HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- COMMUNIC8TE BURY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.08k | £17.97k | £25.66k | £28.18k | £47.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.18k | £47.01k | £39.59k | £31.53k | £53.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 04/05/1949 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/1990 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2015 as amended on 15 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES AND AIMS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE WELFARE OF THE DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED, TO PROVIDE SUITABLE AMENITIES AND FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO ENHANCE THE LIVES OF THE DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED.
Area of benefit
BURY,TOTTINGTON, RAMSBOTTOM, RADCLIFFE, WHITEFIELD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window