Financial history THE LONDON AND MIDDLESEX RIFLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 220902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £461.36k £193.64k £387.97k £488.35k £506.25k
Total expenditure £422.87k £258.43k £384.87k £510.65k £500.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.81k £47.42k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.99k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £381.43k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £106.81k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £20
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £111.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £389.84k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0