THE FINNART HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 220917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bursaries are awarded to 14 to 21 year old Jewish pupils who are in danger of under-achieving because of adverse family and/or financial pressures. Scholarships are available for Jewish students who have the ability to enter university but might not do so because of their circumstances. If funds allow, grants are made to agencies giving care and/or education to Jewish children and young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,430
Total expenditure: £82,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 22 February 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FINNART HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST AND OTHER CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David William Russell Chair 09 April 2025
None on record
DANIEL CARMEL-BROWN Trustee 05 February 2024
None on record
LUCY SILVER Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
MERVYN KAYE Trustee 28 December 2012
None on record
GIL COHEN Trustee 02 November 2011
None on record
Dame Hilary Blume Trustee
UK DISASTER RELIEF
Received: On time
LINDA PATERSON Trustee
None on record
SUE LEIFER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £97.98k £39.35k £16.00k £12.50k £15.43k
Total expenditure £442.42k £384.31k £147.03k £363.42k £82.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 APRIL 1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 12 DECEMBER 1975 AND 7 MAY 1987.
Charitable objects
IN PROVIDING A PRIZE TO BE AWARDED UNDER SUCH RULES AS MAY BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES TO A PUPIL ATTENDING FINNART HOUSE SCHOOL, OATLANDS PARK, WEYBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 19 February 1963 : Standard registration
  • 22 February 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
RADIUS WORKS
BACK LANE
LONDON
NW3 1HL
Phone:
02077949835