HAWARDEN INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides premises and facilities for the benefit of the people of Hawarden.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Flintshire
Governance
- 17 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Merison | Chair | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrea Russell | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.87k | £37.16k | £32.27k | £27.45k | £40.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.67k | £21.99k | £31.92k | £20.07k | £29.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.60k | £15.60k | £3.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEBRUARY 1894 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 17 OCTOBER 1933
Charitable objects
FOR THE MORAL, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL WELFARE OF THE ARTIZAN CLASS OF HAWARDEN.
Area of benefit
HAWARDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 FFORDD PELYDRYN
HAWARDEN
DEESIDE
CH5 3JT
- Phone:
- 01244537207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window