THE RIPON GIRLS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for girls and young women living or attending school within the City of Ripon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 January 1964: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 July 2011: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORETTA WILLIAMS | Chair | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Rt Worshipful the Mayor SID HAWKE | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Ian Pruden | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jill Freeman | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
The Very Revd John Dobson | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||||||
ELIZABETH THOMAS | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBINA JANET MORGAN | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID WILLIAM ELSY | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.90k | £6.63k | £6.52k | £7.69k | £6.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.87k | £751 | £7.48k | £12.78k | £7.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1/12/1944
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERING OF WORK AMONG YOUNG WOMEN AND GIRLS IN RIPON HAVING IN VIEW THEIR SOCIAL, INTELLECTUAL, SPIRITUAL AND BODILY WANTS.
Area of benefit
RIPON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WILLIAMSON HOUSE APARTMENTS
LOW SKELLGATE CLOSE
RIPON
HG4 1WF
- Phone:
- 01765607535
- Email:
- lizripon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window