ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental Protection UK brings together environmental professionals, industry, policy makers, academics and the public to inform debate and influence changes to policy and practice in the areas of air quality and climate change, land quality, and noise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 July 1963: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 277611 THE INSTITUTION OF ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES LIMITED
- THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR CLEAN AIR AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £16.43k | £32.58k | £19.36k | £34.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.62k | £16.45k | £26.10k | £24.28k | £31.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JAN 1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 APRIL 1964, 29 MARCH 1974, 23 OCTOBER 1989, 19 JULY 2007 AND 13 DECEMBER 2007 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO SEEK THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING CHANGES IN THE PUBLIC POLICY AND PRACTICE TO MINIMISE AIR, NOISE AND LAND POLLUTION TO INITIATE, ASSIST, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE INVESTIGATION, CONSIDERATION AND DISCUSSION OF ALL FORMS OF POLLUTION IN ORDER TO ACHIEVE ITS REDUCTION OR PREVENTION AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE REDUCTION OF POLLUTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window