Accounts and annual returns BILLINGHAM UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 221106
Charity reporting is overdue by 1281 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 551 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 551 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 916 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1281 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1281 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required