MARY HUTCHINSON MEMORIAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of 6 almshouses for persons of limited income over 65 years of age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 August 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 January 2010: Standard registration
- MARY HUTCHINSON CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WOODALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM DARWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/12/2019 | 19/12/2020 | 19/12/2021 | 19/12/2022 | 19/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.08k | £18.45k | £18.31k | £18.17k | £18.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.84k | £3.94k | £6.54k | £24.48k | £24.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 24 MAY 1965 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 12 JULY 1985.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER OVER 65 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
NORTHALLERTON URBAN AND RURAL DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUNT & WRIGLEY
83 HIGH STREET
NORTHALLERTON
DL7 8PX
- Phone:
- 01609772502
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window