VILLAGE HALL, HATTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports/ social & recreational activities/arts/dancing/bridge/local authority arranged performers/weddings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Bartlett | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHNNIE ARKWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL DAVID BURKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.49k | £97.98k | £70.00k | £1.27m | £102.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.53k | £35.82k | £46.00k | £34.91k | £85.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £252.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 26/10/1925 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A PLACE OF SOCIAL INTERCOURSE MUTUAL HELPFULNESS MENTAL AND MORAL IMPORVEMENT AND RATIONAL RECREATION FOR THE ADVANTAGE OR BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HATTON WITH HASELEY.
Area of benefit
HATTON WITH HASELEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOUNT PLEASANT
HATTON GREEN
HATTON
WARWICK
CV35 7LA
- Phone:
- 01926 843103
- Email:
- info@hattonvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window