CHARITY OF MARGARET MOSCROP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give financial support to persons resident in the Ecclesiastical Parish of St Cuthbert, Satley, who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Durham
Governance
- 09 July 1963: Standard registration
- MARGARET MOSCROP'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ENID MURRAY | Chair | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Antony Paul Kett Blenkinsopp | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Christine Clark | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN PETER LAMBERT WHALLEY | Trustee | 04 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.03k | £11.46k | £12.29k | £13.29k | £13.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.10k | £5.28k | £5.98k | £8.00k | £12.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31ST AUGUST 1956 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 31 JULY 1974
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND, AT THEIR DISCRETION, THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.CUTHBERT, SATLEY, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SATLEY, ST. CUTHBERT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glebe Farm
West Butsfield
Tow Law
East Butsfield
Bishop Auckland
DL13 4JD
- Phone:
- 01388730318
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window