NORTHERN LADIES ANNUITY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northumberland
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 01 March 2005 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 10 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF SOCIETY FORMED IN 1868. DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1874 AS AMENDED 17 NOVEMBER 1981.
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE TO GOVERNESSES AND OTHER LADIES IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES WHO RESIDE IN, OR HAVE FOR MANY YEARS RESIDED IN, THE NORTH OF ENGLAND, BY WAY OF ANNUITIES OR GRANTS IN MONEY OF KIND.
Area of benefit
NORTH OF ENGLAND AND NATIONAL
Linked charities
- ABBOT ANNUITY
- ASH ANNUITY
- BRALBY HOUSE FUND 1956
- CAPTAIN HENRY BASIL KNOTT ANNUITIES
- CHARLOTTE HUNTER MEMORIAL
- CUTTER FUND FOR INVALIDS 1950
- DAME MARGARET ANNIE KNOTT IN MEMORY OF HER SONS
- EAGLESCLIFFE FUND 1949
- ELIZABETH HALL VINEY FUND 1952
- FRANCIS ISABELLA DUNCAN ANNUITY
- GEORGE A COWIESON BEQUEST
- HELEN BELL ANNUITY
- LADY COCHRANCE FUND 1952
- MITCALFE HOUSE FUND 1956
- MONA TAYLOR FUND
- THE ADELAIDE DAGLISH ANNUITY
- THE ALINE DOXFORD ANNUITY
- THE BLACKETT ANNUITY
- THE CATHERINE IRWIN ANNUITIES
- THE CHARLES AND ANNIE SCOTT HUMBLE ANNUITIES
- THE HEARTSEASE ANNUITY
- THE IDA MCALLUM ANNUITY
- THE ISABELLA STRAKER MEMORIAL ANNUITY
- THE IVY ANNUITY
- THE JOHN COPPIN ANNUITY
- THE L V GRAY ANNUITY
- THE LADY DOXFORD ANNUITY
- THE LADY JOICEY ANNUITY
- THE MAJOR LEADBITTER KNOT ANNUITIES
- THE MARGARET ELIZABETH BROWN ANNUITY
- THE MARGARET TAYLOR ANNUITY
- THE OAK ANNUITY
- THE ROWAN TREE ANNUITY
- THE SARAH DALE ANNUITY
- THE SCARBOROUGH COLLINGWOOD WILSON ANNUITY
- THE ST GEORGE'S ANNUITY
- THE STRAKER ANNUITY
- THE TODD ANNUITY
- THE TYNEMOUTH ANNUITY
- THE VICTORIA JUBLIEE ANNUITY
- THE WALLIS BEQUEST
- WALTER SACKER HILL
- WINDSOR HOUSE FUNDS 1960
- WINSHIP TRUST 1937
- 07 November 1963 : Standard registration
- 22 September 1998 : Removed
- 22 September 1998 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window