ANN HARRISON'S CHARITY
Charity number: 221280
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Almshouses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income: £25,260
Total expenditure: £115,402
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- City Of York
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 September 1965: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1198087 ANN HARRISON'S CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- HARRISON'S CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.61k | £81.03k | £26.74k | £22.70k | £25.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.88k | £18.47k | £31.31k | £24.57k | £115.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS SEALED 6TH AUGUST 1965. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14TH FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WOMEN BEING EITHER A WIDOW OR A SPINSTER AND OF THE AGE OF 50 YEARS OR UPWARDS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
YORK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window