THE LEONARD LAITY STOATE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates almost exclusively in the South West of England, namely Bristol and Somerset, Devon, Cornwall and Dorset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 January 1964: Standard registration
- THE LEONARD LAITY STOATE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PAM STOATE | Chair | 15 July 2000 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Jane Jones | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAVID HARNDEN | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN STOATE LLB | Trustee | 15 July 2000 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER STOATE | Trustee | 12 June 1991 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.81k | £72.24k | £47.86k | £54.49k | £54.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.93k | £84.17k | £79.19k | £83.04k | £80.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JUNE 1950 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10TH NOVEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
A) GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES. B) FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH METHODISM IN BRISTOL OR THE COUNTIES OF SOMERSET, DORSET, DEVON AND CORNWALL.
Area of benefit
SOMERSET, DORSET, DEVON, CORNWALL AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 TOWER HILL
WILLITON
TAUNTON
TA4 4JR
- Phone:
- 07923824313
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window