Financial history THE TALBOT TRUSTS

Charity number: 221356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.85k £72.95k £78.18k £90.24k £84.55k
Total expenditure £94.47k £125.70k £106.97k £74.87k £80.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A