Governing document THE TALBOT TRUSTS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 OCT 1988 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 28 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 DEC 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 JUL 2020 as amended on 25 Feb 2022 as amended on 25 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM, BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY MAKE ARRANGEMENTS FOR SUCH SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO BE PROVIDED FOR THAT PURPOSE BY INSTITUTIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS OUT OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.