Trustees THE TALBOT TRUSTS

Charity number: 221356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Mike Sawkins Chair 01 November 2017
None on record
Georgina Barrett Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Hannah Khatib Trustee 23 January 2025
ROTHERHAM & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Dr Debbie Grunwerg Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Dr Jenny Stephenson Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
SARAH POULTER Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
SAM CALDWELL Trustee 26 March 2021
None on record
MARIA CHRISTINA ASHMORE Trustee 06 December 2018
None on record