ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH STEPHENSON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE ON LOW INCOME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 July 1963: Standard registration
- 30 September 2008: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 September 2008: Funds transferred to 1014862 PICKERING AND FERENS HOMES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.19k | £18.54k | £18.51k | £19.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.94k | £12.14k | £12.24k | £10.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 05 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 12 November 2007 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 12 November 2007 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 09 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 09 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 05 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 21 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 26TH JUNE 1992.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION FOR THE RESIDENTS. THE RESIDENTS SHALL BE PERSONS IN THE FOLLOWING CLASSES AND IN ORDER OF THE FOLLOWING PRIORITY; (A) POOR MEN OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE EITHER EMPLOYED OR RETIRED FROM EMPLOYMENT IN AGRICULTURE. (B) POOR PERSONS OF OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE. (C) POOR PERSONS. THE TRUSTEES MAY PERMIT THE WIFE OF A MAN QUALIFIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH PARAGRAPH 1(A) ABOVE TO RESIDE WITH HIM IN THE ALMSHOUSES. UPON THE DEATH OR SETTING ASIDE OF THE APPOINTMENT OF ANY SUCH MAN WHOSE WIFE HAS BEEN RESIDING WITH HIM IN THE ALMSHOUSES THE TRUSTEES MAY PERMIT HIS WIDOW OR WIFE TO CONTINUE IN OCCUPATION OF THE ALMSHOUSE THERETOFORE OCCUPIED BY THE SAID MAN OR TO OCCUPY SUCH OTHER ALMSHOUSE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY ALLOT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window