CHARITY OF HENRY, DUKE OF CLEVELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing housing for deserving persons of good character aged 60 years or over within the vacinity of Staindrop
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 30 August 1963: Standard registration
- 12 August 2011: Funds received from 220545 LADY BARNARD MEMORIAL FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Barnard | Chair | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eileen Harrop | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Duncan Neil Peake | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Edward Robert Chicken | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BERNARD POOLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.87k | £24.74k | £45.24k | £52.50k | £58.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.48k | £11.50k | £22.38k | £31.00k | £29.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02/06/1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/01/1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/03/2013
Charitable objects
1) ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, WHO ARE AT LEAST 60 YEARS OF AGE AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Comer Terrace
Cockfield
County Durham
DL13 5DN
- Phone:
- 07395 132505
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window