DERBYSHIRE MINERS WELFARE CONVALESCENT HOME AND HOLIDAY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 09 September 1963: Standard registration
- 12 January 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DERBYSHIRE MINERS CONVALESCENT HOME (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20 FEBRUARY 1953 AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 26 JANUARY 1971AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED4 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CONVALESCENT HOME FOR WORKERS IN OR ABOUT COAL MINES IN GREAT BRITAIN AND THEIR WIVES AND FAMILIES AND SUBJECT THERETO THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HOLIDAY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID AND IN NEED OF A CHANGE OF AIR WITH A PREFERENCE AS REGARDS BOTH THE CONVALESCENT HOME AND THE HOLIDAY CENTRE FOR WORKERS IN AND ABOUT COAL MINES IN THE DISTRICT OF DERBYSHIRE (EXCLUSIVE OF SOUTH DERYBSHIRE) AND THEIR WIVES AND FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window