Financial history WEST NORWOOD LODGE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 221434
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2010 28/02/2011 28/02/2012 28/02/2013 28/02/2014
Total gross income £50 £50 £50 £50 £50
Total expenditure £50 £50 £50 £50 £50
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A