WEST NORWOOD LODGE TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity receives 50.04 annually from bond deposited in the 1920's. This annual sum is applied normally to a masonic related charity or other nominated charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 January 1964: Standard registration
- 09 August 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £50 | £50 | £50 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £50 | £50 | £50 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 16 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | 08 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1930
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS THEIR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE SAID LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETINGH FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window