LIVERPOOL WORKSHOPS AND BIRKENHEAD SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (INC )

Charity Number: 221500
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's activities were incorporated into Henshaws Society For Blind People in 1993.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Lancashire
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 August 1963: Standard registration
  • 26 August 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 24 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL OF ERNEST RICHARD HOWARD PROVED AT LIVERPOOL D.P.R. 24 SEPTEMBER 1964 AND SCHEME DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1975 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 19 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
IN OR TOWARDS THE REPAIR, UPKEEP AND INSURANCE OF THE HOWARD HOTEL, LLANDUDNO DURING SUCH TIME AS THE SAID HOTEL IS USED AS A HOME FOR THE BLIND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 29 August 1963 : Standard registration
  • 26 August 1993 : Removed