GRAMER COTTAGES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse accommodation for people over the age of 60 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 September 1963: Standard registration
- CHARITY OF JAMES GRAMER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alison Wortley | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bamford | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Enscot | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Hardy | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Harvey | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|||||
BRENDA EVANS | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE SAUNDERS | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.56k | £23.45k | £18.47k | £27.03k | £29.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.67k | £31.14k | £15.29k | £24.27k | £33.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2024 | 287 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2021 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 27 MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR NEEDY PERSONS WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE, WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MANCETTER OR THE TOWN OF ATHERSTONE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MANCETTER OR THE TOWN OF ATHERSTONE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Mancetter Road
Atherstone
CV9 1NZ
- Phone:
- 01827700034
- Email:
- Suedrakeford63@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window