CRANFORD COTTAGE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and Maintain Almshouses for poor aged persons, with a preference given to persons who have been inhabitants of the area of the Parish of Cranford for a number of years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 24 January 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANLEY STREATHER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.90k | £68.28k | £64.83k | £70.47k | £111.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.13k | £59.24k | £62.29k | £66.99k | £101.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2022 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 May 2021 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13/06/1983.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR AGED PERSONS WITH A PREFERENCE GIVEN TO PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE FORMER PARISH OF CRANFORD FOR NOT LESS THAN TWENTY YEARS NEXT PRECEEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
AREA OF THE FORMER PARISH OF CRANFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Assembly Hall
Fairholme
FELTHAM
Middlesex
TW14 8DE
- Phone:
- 07976251877
- Email:
- LYNSTREATHER@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window