Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD WALTHAM ABBEY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 221563
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £348.83k £370.56k £271.18k £244.20k £286.08k
Total expenditure £306.96k £327.58k £312.07k £324.17k £341.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.47k N/A N/A