Accounts and annual returns URANUS LODGE CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 221586
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2004 Not submitted