WORLD PLOUGHING ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster and preserve the art and improve the skill of ploughing the land. To promote World Championship Ploughing Contests. . To urge the developement and adoption of improved trchniques and aids to man in all branches of agriculture.. ll To support and co-operate with other charitable bodies or associations in thr furtherance of these objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 December 1963: Standard registration
- W P O (Working name)
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
john Hill | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SACHE | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MILLAR | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.14k | £65.14k | £35.82k | £8.74k | £51.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.28k | £31.17k | £7.08k | £24.99k | £125.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1953 AS AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PRESERVE THE ART AND IMPROVE THE SKILL OF PLOUGHING THE LAND - SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FULL DETAILS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saint & Co
Unit 7B Lakeland Business Park
Lamplugh Road
COCKERMOUTH
Cumbria
CA13 0QT
- Phone:
- 01900824118
- Email:
- annamarie@npa.ie
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window