GOOD NEWS FOR EVERYONE!

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to introduce others to the Christian faith, through personal witnessing by members of the charity and through providing Bibles and New Testaments in many different areas of everyday life. Members operate in branches throughout the British Isles and also certain places in Eastern Europe. Funds are also used to provide Scriptures in other countries alongside local Christians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,656,822
Donations and legacies | £3.52m | |
Charitable activities | £99.95k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £31.98k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,496,606
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.50m | |
Retained for future use | £160.22k |
People

11 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
3900 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Czech Republic
- Gibraltar
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Macedonia
- Montenegro
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Serbia
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- GIDEONS (Previous name)
- GIDEONS INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- GIDEONS UK (Previous name)
- GIDEONSUK (Previous name)
- THE GIDEONS (Previous name)
- THE GIDEONS INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- THE GIDEONS INTERNATIONAL IN THE BRITISH ISLES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham John Beckett | Chair | 05 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Joan Erskine | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Susan Jane Redden | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Leslie Christopher Emerson | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Waring | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Beth Louise Ainger Auger | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Mann | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jacqueline Sara Simpson | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew David Newham | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jeremy Edward Bass | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Fred Kershaw | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Graeme Simpson | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Hooper | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Elizabeth Fardell Mann | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rhoda Mary Bourne | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Graham John Ellis | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Iain Lyle Sinclair Gray | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.37m | £2.61m | £3.09m | £2.61m | £3.66m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.86m | £2.45m | £3.10m | £2.88m | £3.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.23m | £2.53m | £3.02m | £2.50m | £3.52m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £127.88k | £73.27k | £67.07k | £95.26k | £99.95k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.34k | £6.07k | £3.70k | £8.03k | £31.98k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £768.92k | £638.52k | £1.07m | £335.29k | £1.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.86m | £2.45m | £3.10m | £2.88m | £3.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £53.02k | £38.46k | £22.05k | £36.52k | £52.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £542.44k | £543.08k | £532.55k | £524.85k | £519.91k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.01m | £2.11m | £2.23m | £1.91m | £2.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £140.42k | £91.34k | £204.40k | £144.46k | £145.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/04/1976 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2005 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2020 as amended on 04 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO INTRODUCE OTHERS TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST BY: • PLACING, PRESENTING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING THE HOLY BIBLE, OR PORTIONS OF THE HOLY BIBLE, IN VARIOUS AREAS OF EVERYDAY LIFE. • ENGAGING IN PERSONAL WITNESSING. • ASSOCIATING TOGETHER FOR SERVICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTERN HOUSE
24 GEORGE STREET
LUTTERWORTH
LE17 4EE
- Phone:
- 01455554241
- Email:
- info@goodnewsuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window