Financial history THE SOCIETY OF THE SALUTATION OF MARY THE VIRGIN LIMITED

Charity number: 221617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £310.68k £303.46k £334.56k £362.13k £448.79k
Total expenditure £358.74k £373.96k £419.69k £400.30k £382.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A