BURNLEY, PENDLE AND ROSSENDALE SCOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group meets monthly to offer support and advise to people with cerebral palsy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 February 1964: Standard registration
- BURNLEY AREA AND ROSSENDALE SPASTICS GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR IAN HUGH BROWN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kathleen Wood | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HIND | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £546 | £1.34k | £1.53k | £2.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.53k | £4.40k | £5.53k | £4.05k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
NATIONAL MODEL CONSTITUTION FOR LOCAL GROUPS AS AMENDED 3 MARCH 1993 AND 9 MARCH 1999 AND 6 APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES AND PURPOSES ONLY TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE, WELFARE , TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT OF PERSONS WITH ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY OR WITH A RELATED DISABILITY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE CLIENTS) WITHIN THE BURNLEY PENDLE AND ROSSENDALE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
BURNLEY PENDLE AND ROSSENDALE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 QUEENS PARK ROAD
BURNLEY
BB10 3LB
- Phone:
- 01282 420483
- Email:
- bprscope@outlook.com
- Website:
-
bprscope.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window