JAMES HENRY BLAKE'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
From a Will made in 1901 to assist poor children and orphans from Mansfield and Chatteris. The CC approved changes in May 2009 for the aims to now read: "To assist children up to 18 years of age in need of support, in any activity of leisure or personal development deemed appropriate by the Trustees.....any such child will be provided with any necessary clothing, equipment or expenses"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 November 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN ELLEN PAGE | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JEAN MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP MICHAEL BEELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/11/2020 | 05/11/2021 | 05/11/2022 | 05/11/2023 | 05/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £506 | £195 | £679 | £10.90k | £6.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £1.00k | £8.36k | £8.60k | £9.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 November 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 November 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 17 DECEMBER 1909 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER S74C DATED 24 MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
TWO EQUAL PARTS OF INCOME - ENABLING AND ASSISTING CHILDREN IN NEED OF SUPPORT FROM THE MANSFIELD DISTRICT AGED UP TO 18 YEARS IN ANY ACTIVITY OR LEISURE OR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES. ONE EQUAL PART OF INCOME - IN SIMILAR MANNER IN RESPECT OF CHILDREN FROM THE DISTRICT OF CHATTERIS (THE DIVISION OF MONIES SPENT BETWEEN MANSFIELD AND CHATTERIS BEING AT THE DISCRETION OF TRUSTEES)
Area of benefit
THE TOWNS OF MANSFIELD AND CHATTERIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PINEWOOD DRIVE
MANSFIELD
NG18 4PG
- Phone:
- 01623632525
- Email:
- hello@blakescharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window