THE ESTATES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief for those in need and educational help in our Parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 August 1963: Standard registration
- SOUTH LOPHAM ESTATES CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA MILLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rona Reeder | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bouchard | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca May Bouchard | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP TEBBLE | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roy Clark | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER NELSON REEDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £4.54k | £4.35k | £4.00k | £3.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £2.53k | £5.04k | £4.25k | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 SEPTEMBER 1982, AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 23 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF SOUTH LOPHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILLITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEMES).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SOUTH LOPHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fen Farm
Low Common
South Lopham
Diss
IP22 2JR
- Phone:
- 01379687645
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window