ANTHONY WALKER'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We annually make disbursements to elderly residents (usually December) who we feel may be in need of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 February 1964: Standard registration
- 30 November 1991: Removed
- BREADSALL UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
- UNITED CHARITIES-BREADSALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Christine Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Heathcote | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH WILLIAM MUNSON | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Katharine Jill Plant | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Hewitt | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MORRIS | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Saunders | Trustee | 13 December 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £724 | £1.68k | £1.06k | £1.17k | £810 | |
|
Total expenditure | £615 | £500 | £820 | £997 | £712 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28 SEPTEMBER 1943 AND SCHEME OF THE 12 OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BREADSALL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BREADSALL
Linked charities
- 03 February 1964 : Standard registration
- 30 November 1991 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
COACH HOUSE
RECTORY LANE
BREADSALL
DERBY
DE21 5LL
- Phone:
- 01332830137
- Email:
- morris684@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window