Financial history CHARNOCK RICHARD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 221793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.54k £2.36k £905 £1.31k £1.31k
Total expenditure £535 £2.00k £6.01k £989 £989
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A