BUSHELL HOUSE

Charity number: 221797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Residential Care Home for the Elderly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BUSHELL'S HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN FRANK BROWN Chair 12 November 2013
THE FOUNDATION FOR RIBBLE VALLEY FAMILIES
Received: On time
Rev Gregor Stewart Trustee 28 March 2023
PARKINSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE GOOSNARGH AND WHITTINGHAM UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN PARKINSON
Received: On time
RICHARD COOKSON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
THE JOHN ROPER BOUNTY FUND
Received: On time
MICHAEL ANSON Trustee 20 October 2021
HUTTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
James Fish Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record
Glyn Jackson Davies Trustee 07 September 2016
None on record
KENNETH JAMES HUDSON Trustee
WHITECHAPEL RECREATION HALL
Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM AND GOOSNARGH SPORTS AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CHARLES DOUGLAS CAREFOOT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £983.18k £977.38k £1.05m £1.12m £1.21m
Total expenditure £908.71k £962.08k £978.28k £1.16m £1.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £71.39k £71.93k £22.47k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.64k £2.02k £2.94k £680 £1.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £936.36k £942.80k £1.00m £1.08m £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.18k £32.57k £42.05k £34.65k £35.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £901.68k £955.55k £970.76k £1.16m £1.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.03k £6.53k £7.53k £7.48k £7.15k
Expenditure - Governance £4.97k £5.20k £6.00k £12.00k £13.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.03k £6.53k £7.53k £7.48k £7.15k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £887.86k £895.05k £887.57k £960.01k £961.95k
Long-term investments £1.23m £1.16m £1.30m £1.24m £1.21m
Other assets £102.04k £121.76k £131.70k £46.35k £65.55k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £38.82k £69.34k £39.69k £73.74k £85.04k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 November 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 November 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bushells House
Mill Lane
Goosnargh
PRESTON
PR3 2BJ
Phone:
01772 865225