THE YORK STREET GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicester City
Governance
- 26 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS GEORGE HARTSHORN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charles Kenneth Binyon | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Robert Smith | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean-Cian O'Hara | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Richard Surrell | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Antony Proudlock | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ROBERT MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN GROOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL EDWARD BANNISTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK TIMMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN CHARLES EDWARD TRUSLOVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER GORDON OBERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID EDWARD WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL PETER HARTSHORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GUY AINSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.94k | £61.69k | £39.94k | £46.88k | £48.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.87k | £52.00k | £36.41k | £56.99k | £41.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL AND DECLARATION OF TRUST 29TH OCTOBER
Charitable objects
THE SPREADING OF THE GOSPEL AND EDUCATION OF CHRISTIANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 WESTMEATH AVENUE
LEICESTER
LE5 6SR
- Phone:
- 07759139365
- Email:
- aj50.groom@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window