VISCOUNT WAKEFIELD'S PHILLIP MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain a memorial to Admiral Arthur Phillip RN and to perpetuate his memory by an annual service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 February 1964: Standard registration
- 09 October 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 November 2012: Re-registered
- 29 September 2014: Funds received from 291642 THE BRITAIN-AUSTRALIA BICENTENNIAL TRUST
- ADMIRAL PHILLIP MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael May | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Melanie Peters | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ANGUS JAMES ROSS | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ANTHONY BOWATER RUSSELL | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL NORMAN EVANS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.38k | £0 | £2.27k | £2.17k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56k | £0 | £2.37k | £2.74k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH DECEMBER 1934 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1941 AND 17TH OCTOBER 1983
Charitable objects
(1) MAINTAINING THE SAID MEMORIAL AND REPLICA THEREOF CLEAN AND IN A PROPER STATE OF REPAIR. (2) TO MAINTAIN A MEMORIAL TO ADMIRAL ARTHUR PHILLIP, RN AND TO PERPETUATE HIS MEMORY BY AN ANNUAL SERVICE. (SEE DEEDS FOR FULL DETAILS).
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Belgrave Road
LONDON
E11 3QW
- Phone:
- 02089894154
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window