THE GLYNN VIVIAN MINERS' MISSION (INCORPORATED 1906) ALSO KNOWN AS THE INTERNATIONAL MISSION TO MINERS

Charity Number: 221853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support financially current Missionary activities in countries as diverse as Chile, Sierra Leone Romania, Ethiopia and the Ukraine. Regular reports received from these countries attest to the impact of these activities for the good in the lives of many people in the mining communities served by the local evangelists.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £57,660
Total expenditure: £92,654

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Burundi
  • Ethiopia
  • Kenya
  • Macedonia
  • Romania
  • Sierra Leone
  • South Africa
  • Ukraine

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1969: Standard registration
  • 12 August 1999: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE INTERNATIONAL MINERS MISSION (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gregory Ian Le Roux Trustee 26 May 2021
BREADTRUST
Received: On time
JOHN ANTHONY DOOHAN Trustee 03 October 2012
GILGAL HOUSE HEALING CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID RICKMAN SHILLITOE Trustee 10 April 1972
FARMERS' CHRISTIAN POSTAL SERVICE
Received: On time
VICTORIA IRENE YORKE Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL GEORGE JARVIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.61k £59.89k £52.18k £111.16k £57.66k
Total expenditure £62.60k £64.65k £64.81k £94.83k £92.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 1906 AND SCHEME OF 7 JUNE 1940
Charitable objects
FUND FOR PURPOSE OF ENABLING GLYNN VIVIAN MINERS' MISSION TO ACQUIRE OTHER MISSION HALLS IN ENGLAND AND ELSEWHERE AND FOR COMPLETION, EQUIPMENT, REPAIR OR UPKEEP OF SUCH PREMISES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 March 1969 : Standard registration
  • 12 August 1999 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Flat 5
Old Rectory Court
61 Wood Street
Barnet
EN5 4BL
Phone:
02037306841