YOXALL HASLINGTON VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPERATION OF VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS IN THE AREA OF HASLINGTON, CHESHIRE EAST
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 10 October 1963: Standard registration
- YOXALL VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin William Deakin | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith ANn Littlewood | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joellen Margaret Criddle | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Lewis | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steph Fearn | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Wooley | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rohit Topiwalla | Trustee | 15 November 2004 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY PEAKE | Trustee | 12 November 1990 |
|
|
||||
PETE THREADGOLD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.56k | £23.57k | £27.25k | £21.23k | £25.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.73k | £10.84k | £12.86k | £18.59k | £17.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 10 SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HASLINGTON. WITHOUT DISTINCTION OFF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF HASLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yoxall Village Hall
Crewe Road
Haslington
CREWE
CW1 5QZ
- Phone:
- 07512693796
- Email:
- yoxallbookings@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window