THOMAS BAYES CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH HOLYHEAD ROAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH,COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity seeks to help families in the area that have fallen on hard times
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Coventry City
Governance
- 31 December 1963: Standard registration
- THOMAS BAYES CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH HOLLYHEAD ROAD, CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH COVENTRY (Previous name)
- THOMAS BAYES CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH HOLYHEAD ROAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (Previous name)
- THOMAS BAYES CHARITY IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (Previous name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Young | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELLIMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA RAINBOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVE HOLTOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £2.01k | £2.05k | £2.09k | £5.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.30k | £1.62k | £2.56k | £1.90k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2023 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 7/12/1923 AND SCHEME DATED 30/3/1954.
Charitable objects
1) MAINTENANCE OF HOLYHEAD ROAD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH BUILDING, SERVICES AND SUNDAY SCHOOL. 2) DONATING TO POOR AND SICK PEOPLE
Area of benefit
COVENTRY COUNTY BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 BARKERS BUTTS LANE
COVENTRY
CV6 1DU
- Phone:
- 02476598157
- Email:
- dotbtay@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window