GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY NURSES FUND

Charity number: 221959
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Established with the help of community nurses in 1974, the charity aims: 1. To provide financial support to people who are experiencing difficulties as a consequence of illness or disability; 2. To provide financial assistance to community nurses, including retired nurses, in cases of need; 3. To support nursing services in the community by the provision of equipment and educational grants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,819
Total expenditure: £18,805

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 January 1980: Standard registration
  • 24 January 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY NURSES' WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.44k £17.85k £16.70k £21.92k £18.82k
Total expenditure £16.01k £22.36k £11.72k £17.60k £18.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 28 JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF RETIRED DISTRICT NURSES WHO ARE IN NEED WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO AT ANY TIME WERE EMPLOYED AS DISTRICT NURSES FOR THE SOUTHAM WOODMANCOTE AND PRESTBURY AREAS OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 28 January 1980 : Standard registration
  • 24 January 1994 : Removed