CHARITIES OF MARY AND ELIZABETH BECKETT FOR THE POOR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 21 August 1963: Standard registration
- 19 January 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £297 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 03 February 2012 | 825 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 31 January 2012 | 822 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF MARY BECKETT DATED 16TH JAN. 1855; WILL OF ELIZABETH BECKETT, DATED 8TH FEB. 1858 IN YORK W.R. PARISH REPORTS 1893-98, K.R. P130. AS AMENDED ON 21ST DECEMBER 1999 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF A SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES AC
Charitable objects
PURCHASE OF FUEL, CLOTHES, MEAT OR BREAD TO BE DISTRIBUTED AT CHRISTMAS IN EVERY YEAR AMONGST THE POOR OF MEANWOOD.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MEANWOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window