SIR THOMAS GRESHAM CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is the provision of eight Almshouses known as the Gresham Almshouses; the annual payment of an allowance to the almsfolk; and the payment of -ú100 per annum to each of the four Gresham lecturers in Divinity, Astronomy, Music and Geometry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £101,714 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
Governance
- 26 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CITY OF LONDON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.74k | £64.60k | £66.72k | £85.95k | £105.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.18k | £66.65k | £68.18k | £87.42k | £106.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £84.47k | £101.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF SIR THOMAS GRESHAM 5TH JULY 1575 AND ACT 8 GEO.III CAP.XXXII R.V.6P291.
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF EIGHT ALMSHOUSES KNOWN AS THE GRESHAM ALMSHOUSES; (2) THE PAYMENT OF $53 6S 8D. PER ANNUM TO THE OCCUPIERS THEREOF; (3) THE PAYMENT OF $50 PER ANNUM TO EACH OF FOUR LECTURERS IN DIVINITY, ASTRONOMY, MUSIC AND GEOMETRY.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
GUILDHALL
LONDON
EC2P 2EJ
- Phone:
- 02073321382
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window