Financial history HUBBERHOLME CHURCH POOR PASTURE

Charity Number: 222013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.11k £916 £1.01k £1.01k £925
Total expenditure £623 £554 £648 £544 £584
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A