CREIGHTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hall has had a good year as it has been free from major repairs. The fundraising committee have done an excellent job but events still need more support from villagers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 22 April 1964: Standard registration
- GREIGHTON MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Livingstone | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Livingstone | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jean Lawrence | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SHELAGH COXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RAYMOND CARSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JAYNE IMESON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOAN LITTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
GORDON COXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/05/2020 | 15/05/2021 | 15/05/2022 | 15/05/2023 | 15/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.04k | £23.70k | £11.11k | £15.10k | £33.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.56k | £28.56k | £11.81k | £17.66k | £47.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.00k | £20.24k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 May 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 May 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 336 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 2/5/1961
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EMBLETON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OPINIONS FOR USE IN PARTICULAR TO IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EMBLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Woodstead
Embleton
Alnwick
Northumberland
NE66 3XY
- Phone:
- 01665576981
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window